+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/13/2015
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 8
- General Order
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Title restored
- Emergency clause restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Osborn (principal House author)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Pittman
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator David
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 8, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 4