+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 4
- HAs adopted
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 11
- General Order
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
- Title restored
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 3
- General Order, Considered
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sparks
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 25, 2018: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 9
April 3, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
March 15, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor