+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 17
- General Order
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Remove Representative Gann as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lepak
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 14
- General Order, Considered
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Daniels
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
March 22, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor