+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCs named GCCA
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 31
- General Order
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
- General Order, Considered
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Martin (principal House author)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Jolley
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 6
March 10, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor