+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12
- General Order, Considered
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Dahm
- First Reading
+ − Vote
April 11, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor