+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
- Emergency added
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Howard
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
March 23, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor