+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vetoed 04/30/2018
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 37
- General Order
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Banking and Business
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Leewright
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 18
March 12, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor