+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Derby (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Standridge
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2014: House Division
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 6
February 25, 2014: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor