+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 17
- Referred for engrossment
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Watson (principal House author)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Finance Committee
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Mazzei
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
April 6, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 6
March 31, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
March 8, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor