+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/18/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 9
- General Order
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 5
- General Order, Considered
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Hall (principal House author)
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator David
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
March 22, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 25, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor