+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 18
- General Order
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Osborn (Leslie)
- Remove Representative Osborn (Leslie) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fetgatter
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 10
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Pittman
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator David
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 11
April 10, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 6
March 15, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 6