+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion expired
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Allen
- Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 32
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Cockroft (principal House author)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Allen
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor