+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6
- General Order
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
- Emergency clause restored
- Referred for engrossment
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author)
- Referred to Appropriations
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Emergency added
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Jech
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 26
March 13, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor