+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Calendar
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11
- General Order, Considered
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Conley (principal House author)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator Bergstrom; authored by Senator Bice
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 12, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor