+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/02/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- General Order
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman
- CR; Do Pass Long-term Care and Senior Services Committee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Long-term Care and Senior Services
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Hardin (principal House author)
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Simpson
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 30, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 8