+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Administrative Rules, Direct to Calendar
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Dugger
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 26, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 3