+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/19/2022
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Emergency added
- Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Montgomery
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
February 22, 2022: Senate Certain Investments. Emergency.
- Yeas: 48
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor