+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Government Efficiency, Direct to Calendar
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Dills (principal House author)
- Authored by Senator Rader
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 3, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1