+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9
- General Order, Considered
- General Order, considered and deferred
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Murphey (principal House author)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Dahm
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 9, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor