+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Laid over
- Ayes: 35 Nays: 45
- JCR failed of adoption
- General Order
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- JCR adopted
- Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 15
- Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 8
- Referred for engrossment
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Emergency added
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Newell
- Coauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author)
- Coauthored by Justice
- Authored by Senator Jolley
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 23, 2013: House Advance The Question
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 26
May 23, 2013: House Adopt Jcr
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 45
- Absent: 21
May 16, 2013: Senate Table
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 12
May 16, 2013: Senate Table
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 7
May 16, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 8
May 15, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 8