+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/07/2018
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
- Sent to Governor
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Amended
- General Order
- Title restored
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1
- Referred for engrossment
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Yen
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2018: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 3
April 11, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
March 12, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor