+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Veto message read
- Vetoed 05/06/2013
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
- Title restored
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Banz, Hulbert, McCullough
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 7
- General Order
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
- Title restored
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy), Henke
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Ellis
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Pensions committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Pensions
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Anderson
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 29, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
March 28, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 8
March 20, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 11, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor