+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Vancuren, Boles, Caldwell (Trey), Ranson, Pittman
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 17
- Signed, returned to Senate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee
- Remove Representative Osburn as principal House author and substitute with Representative Walke
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Osburn, Branham, Kiger, Albright, Luttrell
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
- Referred for engrossment
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 3
March 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
March 4, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor