+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 11
- Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 65 Nays: 5
- Motion to reconsider tabled
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Coody (Ann)
- Emergency failed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 33
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Coody (Ann)
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 29
- General Order
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
- Emergency clause restored
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
- Coauthored by Pittman
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
- Emergency clause stricken
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Coody (Ann) (principal House author)
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Stanislawski
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Ford
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
March 3, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 9