+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 8
- General Order
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Banking and Business
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Daniels
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 18
March 6, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor