+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 4
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger
- General Order
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Bullard
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
- General Order, Considered
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Stephens
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative ODonnell (principal House author)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Allen
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 17
March 30, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9