+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Calendar
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Strom (principal House author)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Kirt
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 12, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4