+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/29/2019
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
- JCR adopted
- General Order
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- JCR adopted
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
- Coauthored by Lawson
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hilbert
- Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
- Coauthored by Senator Rader
- Authored by Senator Thompson
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 23, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 14
May 21, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
May 20, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 27