+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Banking and Business
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Pugh
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor