+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1
- JCR adopted
- General Order
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- JCR adopted
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Emergency removed
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hilbert
- Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
- Coauthored by Senator Hall
- Authored by Senator Thompson
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
May 17, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 26
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor