+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Ownbey (principal House author)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Simpson
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 7, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor