+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/21/2021
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5
- JCR adopted
- General Order
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2
- JCR adopted
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hilbert
- Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
- Coauthored by Senator Hall
- Authored by Senator Thompson
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 7
May 14, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor