+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
- General Order, Considered
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Stiles (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Crain
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 5, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor