+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/02/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 10
- General Order
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Biggs (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sykes
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
March 26, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 9
March 19, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
March 4, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor