+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 7
- Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 8
- General Order, Considered
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Emergency added
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author)
- Authored by Senator Kirt
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 5, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
March 24, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor