+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/21/2019
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 11
- HAs adopted
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 21
- Referred for engrossment
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
- General Order, Considered
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author)
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Dahm
- First Reading
+ − Votes (4)
May 15, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 11
April 2, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 8
March 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 4