+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
- General Order, Amended
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- General Order, considered and deferred
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Thomsen (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator McCortney
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12
March 7, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor