+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Hickman (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Newberry
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 25, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor