+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (67)
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/21/2019
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- To Senate
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
- CCR adopted
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR read
- Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Sneed
- Coauthored by Sneed
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCs named David, Leewright, McCortney, Newhouse, Brooks, Young
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Bice
- Coauthored by Senator Silk
- Coauthored by Senator Thompson
- Coauthored by Senator Quinn
- Coauthored by Senator Bullard
- Coauthored by Senator Coleman
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Standridge
- Coauthored by Senator Sharp
- Coauthored by Senator Rosino
- Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
- Coauthored by Senator Pederson
- Coauthored by Senator Dugger
- Coauthored by Senator Haste
- Coauthored by Senator Hall
- Coauthored by Senator Jech
- Coauthored by Senator Kidd
- Coauthored by Senator Rader
- Coauthored by Senator Leewright
- Coauthored by Senator Scott
- Coauthored by Senator Murdock
- Remove as coauthor Senator Murdock
- Coauthored by Senator Murdock
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell
- General Order
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Remove Representative Martinez as principal House author and substitute with Representative Newton
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
- Title restored
- Remove Senator Bergstrom as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator David
- Emergency removed
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Emergency added
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (5)
May 13, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
April 22, 2019: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 20
April 22, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 2
April 10, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 14
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor