+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 11/22/2021
On November 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On November 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On November 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1
- General Order
On November 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On November 18, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass State and Federal Redistricting Committee
- Second Reading referred to State and Federal Redistricting
On November 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
- Coauthored by Representative Martinez
- Referred for engrossment
- Engrossed to House
On November 17, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On November 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
- Reported Do Pass Select Committee on Redistricting; CR filed
- Second Reading referred to Select Committee on Redistricting
On November 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Paxton
- Authored by Senator Treat
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
November 18, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
November 17, 2021: Senate Committee Vote
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor