+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/24/2013
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hulbert
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 12
April 24, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor