+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed 05/29/2013
- Sent to Governor
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator McAffrey (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Floyd
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 4
April 24, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor