+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/24/2013
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 6
- General Order
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Blackwell
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 24, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor