+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by McAffrey
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 39
- General Order
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Armes
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 9
May 1, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor