+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House
- Considered
- Direct to Calendar
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Vaughan
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Coauthored by Bennett, Russ, Turner, Shoemake, Hulbert, Henke, Floyd, Nollan, Cox
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Curtis), Cockroft, Rousselot, Sears, Wright, Sanders, Mulready, Ownbey, Perryman, Grau, Martin (Steve), Lockhart, Trebilcock, Casey, Walker
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Kirby, Sherrer, Banz, Quinn, Cooksey, Wesselhoft, Coody, Wood, Denney, Christian, Dorman, Condit, Brumbaugh, Johnson, Cannaday
- Adopted, referred for engrossment
- Considered
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author)
- Authored by Representative Nelson
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor