+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4
- JCR adopted
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Direct to Calendar
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- JCR adopted
- General Order
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 5
- Referred for engrossment
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall
- Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
- Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
May 17, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 26