+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 16
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Bashore
- General Order
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Ford
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 16, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor