+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/25/2022
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 16
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson
- SA's read, adopted
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- SA's received
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator David, Garvin, Hall, Jech, Kidd, Leewright, Murdock, Pemberton, Rader, Rosino, Simpson, Standridge, Stanley, Stephens, Taylor, Weaver
- Coauthored by Senator Rogers
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10
- General Order, Amended
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Daniels
- Coauthored by Senator Dahm
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Bullard
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
- Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
- Amended by floor substitute
- Emergency added
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 19
- Referred for engrossment
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Stearman
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (17)
+ − Votes (5)
April 28, 2022: Senate Amendment
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 5
April 28, 2022: Senate Suspend Rule
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 5
April 28, 2022: Senate Amendment
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 5
April 28, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor