+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- CCR adopted
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 1
- To Senate
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Coleman, Paxton, Weaver, Allen, Rogers, Matthews, Brooks
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Transportation
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
- Referred for engrossment
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Frix
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Remove Representative Frix as principal House author and substitute with Representative Luttrell
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Frix
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 20, 2022: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
April 25, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor