+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2
- General Order
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace
- Remove Representative Wallace as principal House author and substitute with Representative Newton
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Wallace
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 19, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor